Trustees The Battle of the Atlantic Memorial

Charity number: 1109312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gary Lawrence Doyle Chair 06 December 2016
None on record
Thomas William Robert Lee Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Steven Mark Jones Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record
Rev Canon Dr Crispin Pailing Trustee 30 July 2020
LIVERPOOL BLITZ MEMORIAL APPEAL
Received: On time
MISSION IN THE ECONOMY
Received: On time
LOCAL SOLUTIONS
Received: On time
EARLY MUSIC AS EDUCATION
Received: 1 day late
MICAH LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
Janet Pickavance Trustee 30 July 2020
EARLY MUSIC AS EDUCATION
Received: 1 day late
Benjamin Phillip Birkett Pinnington Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
Commodore Phillip Waterhouse Trustee 18 June 2020
Broughton House - Veteran Care Village
Received: On time
ALEXANDRA HOUSE (ROYAL UNITED SERVICE SHORT STAY RESIDENCE FOR SERVICE CHILDREN)
Received: On time
ALEXANDRA HOUSE CHILDCARE CENTRE (PLYMOUTH) CIO
Received: On time
ANTHONY DOUGLAS MUNCER RD MNM Trustee 25 March 2019
BROCKLEBANK PRESERVATION SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
Andrew William Hines Trustee 25 March 2019
THE CONWAY MERCHANT NAVY TRUST
Received: On time
STEPHEN BURROWS Trustee 25 March 2019
WIRRAL HOSPICE ST JOHN'S
Received: On time
PAMELA ADA BROWN Trustee 06 December 2016
THE MERSEY MISSION TO SEAFARERS
Received: On time