Financial history THAMES HOSPICE

Charity number: 1108298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.09m £11.36m £12.63m £13.04m £15.54m
Total expenditure £8.06m £9.80m £10.40m £11.25m £13.52m
Income from government contracts £370.32k £574.64k £522.15k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.60m £2.52m £2.56m £7.05m £7.09m
Income - Donations and legacies £5.96m £4.53m £6.05m £3.88m £4.22m
Income - Other trading activities £2.29m £2.43m £2.73m £1.96m £4.00m
Income - Charitable activities £256.00k £3.85m £3.47m £4.23m £7.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £491.00k £482.00k £290.00k £93.00k £93.00k
Income - Other £97.00k £64.00k £94.00k £2.88m £0
Income - Legacies £1.75m £1.81m £1.61m £620.00k £718.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.12m £5.40m £5.25m £6.35m £7.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.94m £4.39m £5.15m £4.90m £5.98m
Expenditure - Governance £98.77k £104.00k £87.00k £245.00k £319.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £50.00k £47.00k £25.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0