Financial history AMAZING PLAY

Charity number: 1109383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £464 £1.42k £1.00k £0
Total expenditure £758 £553 £1.44k £539 £539
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A