Accounts and annual returns COPE (CAMBRIDGESHIRE OLDER PEOPLE'S ENTERPRISE)

Charity number: 1110887
Charity reporting is up to date (161 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 July 2024 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 July 2024 161 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window