Trustees WHAT IF..? (COMMUNITY) LTD.

Charity number: 1111016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV CANON CHRIS STONE Chair 19 May 2011
THE COLLEGE OF PREACHERS TRUST
Received: On time
Claire Patricia Mary Beazley-Mungovan Trustee 15 January 2020
None on record
ELEANOR ELIZABETH WILMSHURST ELCOMBE Trustee 13 March 2019
None on record
MAXINE ANN BULLEN Trustee 19 November 2012
None on record
RUTH G HOWARD Trustee 27 May 2011
None on record