DEGANWY OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1108101
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 21 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 06 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 06 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)