Financial history UNITED UTILITIES TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1108296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.03m £4.52m £4.00m £3.50m £3.77m
Total expenditure £5.44m £4.56m £4.07m £3.46m £3.45m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.03m £4.52m £4.00m £3.50m £3.77m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £443 £583 £192
Income - Other £1.41k £759 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.44m £4.56m £4.07m £3.46m £3.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.09k £10.49k £8.94k £9.36k £9.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £248.67k £169.62k £28.46k £51.87k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0