AFRICA VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1109024
Charity reporting is overdue by 1764 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 03/04/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £35.00k £3.00k £2.00k £2.50k £2.50k
Total expenditure £3.45k £2.98k £1.96k £2.45k £2.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A