THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST

Charity number: 1108369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SAVVAS SAVVA Trustee
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
JOHN CHRONIAS Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Chrisanthi Dina Constantinou Trustee 09 July 2017
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
DIONYSSIOS LIVERAS Trustee 04 January 2012
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
Sotirios Economou Trustee 10 January 2019 None on record
LOUIS LOIZOU Trustee
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN COMMUNITIES CENTRAL FUND LIMITED Received: On time
MICHAEL PILINAS Trustee None on record
ANDREW MICHAEL Trustee 01 August 2013
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
ANDREAS KYPRIANIDES Trustee
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
His Eminence Archbishop Nikitas Lioulias Trustee 27 July 2019
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
ST NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX EDUCATIONAL CENTRE Received: On time
SAINT BARBARA'S GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (SOUTHEND ON SEA DISTRICT) Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF COVENTRY Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BRISTOL Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL AND THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN CHRYSOSTOM IN CHELTENHAM AND ENVIRONS Received: On time
SAINT NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST KATHERINE Overdue by 81 days
ST BARNABAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY FUND Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CONSTANTINE AND ST HELEN Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF HOLY ANARGYRI TRUST Received: On time
ST JOHN THE BAPTIST GREEK ORTHODOX TRUST Received: On time
YIOTA NICHOLAS Trustee
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
Evangelos Kritikos Trustee 09 July 2018
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
DEMOS HABESHIS Trustee 25 April 2013 None on record
LEONTIOS CHRISTODOULOU Trustee
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time
YIALOUSA (AND SUBURBS) ASSOCIATION Overdue by 81 days
SAVVAS MASTRIDES Trustee
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE) Received: On time