BRISTOL CHARITIES

Charity number: 1109141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
FEOFFMENT DATED 16 MARCH 1621 AND BY WILL DATED 27 MARCH 1627 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 2 NOVEMBER 1926, 28 JULY 1942 AND 29 APRIL 2005 (AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 20 MAY 2005.)
Charitable objects
INCOME DISTRIBUTED BETWEEN CERTAIN NAMED ALMSHOUSES AND OTHER BODIES.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Registration history
  • 22 August 2005 : Standard registration
  • 17 March 2015 : Removed