Dogfen lywodraethu EARLY YEARS NETWORK TOWER HAMLETS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/12/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND THE FAMILIES OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE, WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.