ANGELS OF THE NORTH

Charity number: 1109033
Charity reporting is overdue by 216 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 216 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 16 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 16 April 2017 On time Download