ANGELS OF THE NORTH

Charity number: 1109033
Charity reporting is overdue by 211 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nitin Shukla Trustee 15 February 2013
Haven Tyneside Limited Received: On time
Connected Voice Received: On time
DR RAM REDDY Trustee 21 November 2012 None on record
PAUL EZHILCHELVAN Trustee 21 November 2012 None on record
Dr HARI SHUKLA OBE Chair 21 November 2012 None on record
GARY STAKER Trustee 21 November 2012 None on record
ALBERT WHITING Trustee None on record
SHARON BROWN Trustee 21 November 2012 None on record
ANDREA TAYLOR Trustee 30 November 2011 None on record
TAHIR RASHID Trustee 21 November 2012 None on record
MR VISHWANATH PULLE Trustee 05 September 2011 None on record
STEPHANE BOMMEL Trustee 21 November 2012 None on record
TRACEY HARTLEY Trustee 02 April 2011 None on record