LOWLAND SEARCH DOGS (SUSSEX)

Charity number: 1110700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 February 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required