AHENFIE CHAPEL

Charity number: 1109280
Charity reporting is up to date (100 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £398.48k £387.27k £302.01k £123.13k £101.19k
Total expenditure £395.43k £383.13k £301.86k £127.54k £107.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A