THE REGIMENTAL CHARITY OF THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT (KING'S, LANCASHIRE AND BORDER)

Charity number: 1116946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £506.43k £356.31k £318.26k £344.95k £333.03k
Total expenditure £464.47k £454.39k £318.48k £362.31k £303.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £269.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £43.03k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £116.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £77.33k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £269.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £442.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A