THE REGIMENTAL CHARITY OF THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT (KING'S, LANCASHIRE AND BORDER)

Charity number: 1116946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lt Col Robert Carr Trustee 20 December 2020 None on record
DR Myszka Guzkowska Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Brigadier Frazer Lawrence OBE Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
COL Andrew Dennis Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
MICHAEL JEREMY GORICK DL Trustee 01 January 2014
QUEEN ELIZABETH'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL BLACKBURN LIMITED Received: On time
LT COL Thomas Kelly Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
ANDREW KENNEDY COL Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
LT COL Neil Locke Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Nicholas Kennon LT COL Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Kam Kothia Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record