ADUR COMMUNITY LEISURE LIMITED

Charity number: 1112020
Charity is in administration
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £2.49m £3.65m £3.06m £3.46m £3.74m
Total expenditure £2.39m £3.04m £3.02m £3.54m £3.71m
Income from government contracts £0 £38.00k £9.00k £160.00k £145.00k
Income from government grants £190.00k £180.00k £170.00k £11.98k £17.85k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £643.87k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.30m £3.01m £3.06m £3.46m £3.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £799 £501 £1.25k £863 £992
Income - Other £190.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.30m £2.97m £2.97m £3.45m £3.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £69.33k £49.19k £90.06k £96.32k
Expenditure - Governance £34.15k £0 £5.15k £6.18k £6.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £51.64k £0 £0 £0 £0