HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY OF HAVERING

Charity number: 1110937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 12 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 01 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 01 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 29 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 16 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required