Accounts and annual returns Kings Academy PTA

Charity number: 1109587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 March 2021 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required