Dogfen lywodraethu CYNGOR AR BOPETH SIR DDINBYCH CITIZENS ADVICE DENBIGHSHIRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MAY 2005. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 SEP 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2019 as amended on 27 Apr 2022 as amended on 01 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in the whole of England and Wales, principally Denbighshire and surrounding areas.
Maes buddion
DENBIGHSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.