Imam Zakariya Academy

Charity number: 1110008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 May 2018 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 February 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required