Trustees ALL SAINTS CENTRE HUTHWAITE LTD
Charity number: 1111658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES ALISTAIR KINGSLEY MAIDEN | Chair | 12 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Robotham | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Davis | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Shaw | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS RICHARDSON WHITTAKER | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEOFFREY ROTHERY | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS CHRIS EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE MAIDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN SIMMONDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.