Financial history NEW PARK COMMUNITY AND ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £217.75k £237.73k £215.99k £175.46k £115.69k
Total expenditure £218.38k £166.23k £161.25k £213.62k £198.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.56k N/A N/A £25.00k £30.77k