Trustees BRANDWOOD CENTRE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1110808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD GREEN | Chair | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Alam | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Brookes | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Humpheries | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jannette Clay | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
James le Grys | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Clay | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
BHARTI PARMAR | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LEA BURFORD | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUE PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.