Financial history NORTH CHESHIRE JEWISH NURSERY PROPERTY TRUST

Charity number: 1110468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £30.00k £30.00k £30.00k £0 £355.67k
Total expenditure £34.19k £34.19k £34.19k £4.19k £362.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A