NATIONAL YOUTH STRING ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1110462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £119.31k £111.19k £103.04k £125.30k £54.69k
Total expenditure £100.54k £107.50k £102.66k £124.07k £41.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A