BLEAKHOLT ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1110503
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.03m £1.80m £1.96m £1.07m £1.11m
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.53m £1.63m £1.76m £1.37m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £794.77k £1.52m £1.56m £785.59k £943.78k
Income - Other trading activities £168.81k £207.07k £173.42k £164.17k £62.76k
Income - Charitable activities £62.72k £72.82k £217.32k £115.61k £95.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.94k £3.56k £8.42k £5.79k £3.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £539.49k £1.30m £1.36m £253.18k £540.74k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.46m £1.53m £1.68m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £83.45k £75.30k £98.60k £82.37k £58.77k
Expenditure - Governance £10.71k £9.61k £6.51k £13.89k £4.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0