Accounts and annual returns TRUMPET SOUND MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1110544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 May 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 May 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required