Trustees ALOPECIA UK

Charity number: 1111304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Ray Chair 28 November 2015
None on record
Steve Lindsey Trustee 07 May 2021
None on record
Damian Hamber Trustee 27 April 2021
None on record
Shalini Vaghela Trustee 30 January 2021
None on record
Emma Hickinbotham Trustee 28 January 2021
THE JAPAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
Lynn Wilks Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Lucy Rogers Trustee 27 October 2017
None on record
Ruth McPherson Trustee 27 October 2017
None on record