Accounts and annual returns SRI LANKAN TRUST TO AID AND REBUILD TANGALLE

Charity number: 1113158
Charity reporting is overdue by 1788 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 327 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 327 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 692 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 692 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1057 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1057 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1422 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1422 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1788 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1788 days