G-FORCE

Charity number: 1110767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £155.41k £196.35k £147.90k £195.14k £203.51k
Total expenditure £160.64k £155.41k £166.76k £186.73k £213.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £2.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.67k £0 N/A N/A £2.00k