Financial history ANTON BRUCKNER CHOIR

Charity number: 1110712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.57k £6.37k £28.86k £6.41k £6.36k
Total expenditure £14.37k £5.44k £29.33k £4.18k £5.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A