Financial history THE KNOWLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1111085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £16.53k £18.51k £16.86k £20.60k £113.57k
Total expenditure £17.57k £19.13k £13.59k £11.91k £66.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £35.00k