CARIBBEAN VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1112024
Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 73 days
Accounts and TAR 08 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 73 days
Annual return 08 September 2019 25 September 2020 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 08 September 2018 03 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 08 September 2017 03 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 08 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 September 2016 Not Required