CARIBBEAN VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1112024
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 08/09/2015 08/09/2016 08/09/2017 08/09/2018 08/09/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A