Financial history BADGER TRUST

Charity number: 1111440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £166.67k £302.15k £228.31k £257.18k £276.11k
Total expenditure £160.28k £199.51k £246.27k £219.55k £237.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A