AFC DRONFIELD JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1112653
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 June 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 June 2021 48 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 October 2020 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 13 November 2020 197 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 July 2019 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 July 2019 84 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 May 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 May 2018 29 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 April 2017 On time Download