AFC DRONFIELD JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1112653
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £49.68k £45.90k £49.65k £59.18k £62.73k
Total expenditure £50.65k £45.89k £49.40k £58.55k £57.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A