Accounts and annual returns THE WALLPAPER HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1113163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required