Financial history THE WALLPAPER HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1113163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.01k £7.27k £5.04k £8.48k £7.00k
Total expenditure £12.85k £4.75k £1.42k £8.48k £9.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A