CRIBS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 14 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 10 January 2017 On time Download