Anglo American Foundation

Charity number: 1111719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.30m £2.07m £3.44m £2.52m £4.42m
Total expenditure £497.89k £2.17m £3.44m £2.30m £4.37m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.30m £2.07m £3.43m £2.50m £4.41m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £173 £1.55k £8.46k £13.46k £3.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £7.31k £10.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £497.89k £2.17m £3.44m £2.30m £4.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £7.31k £10.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £497.89k £2.17m £3.44m £2.30m £4.36m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0