The Gerald and Gail Ronson Family Foundation

Charity number: 1111728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 June 2017 On time Download