The Gerald and Gail Ronson Family Foundation

Charity number: 1111728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £968.68k £602.67k £563.11k £12.39m £50.35m
Total expenditure £1.49m £1.54m £2.03m £10.57m £3.74m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £12.12m £49.30m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £968.68k £602.67k £563.11k £267.10k £1.05m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.36m £1.54m £2.03m £10.57m £3.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £81.33k
Expenditure - Governance £129.70k £115.43k £68.03k £137.27k £15.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.36m £1.42m £1.96m £10.43m £3.53m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £81.33k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0