Women's Association For Networking and Development

Charity number: 1111925
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 March 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 18 March 2021 18 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 06 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 23 April 2019 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 23 April 2019 54 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time Download