Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S PRIMARY SCHOOL WITHYHAM PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 March 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required