YALA FUND

Charity number: 1111692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 February 2017 On time Download