YALA FUND

Charity number: 1111692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £57.62k £47.14k £64.75k £39.18k £24.73k
Total expenditure £57.17k £50.67k £64.53k £47.60k £26.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A