Accounts and annual returns FOSTS FRIENDS OF ST TERESA'S

Charity number: 1112239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 August 2019 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required